|
09/14/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 236, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 13. Page 4917.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|