Assembly
|
09/27/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 10. Page 5185.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|