|
09/29/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 961, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 16.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2024
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|