California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2453 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2024

Amended

Bill June 24, 2024
Bill April 18, 2024