California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2457 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2024

Amended

Bill May 2, 2024
Bill April 3, 2024