Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 16). | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9). | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | Read first time. To print. |