California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2462 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2024

Amended

Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 20, 2024
Bill April 8, 2024