Assembly | 04/24/2024 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2024 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | (Pending re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES.) | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4775.) | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | Read first time. To print. |