Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/29/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5484.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|