Assembly
|
09/27/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 15.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 11.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Stern.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 12.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 5184.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|