Senate | 08/15/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2024 | In committee: Referred to suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5486.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | Read first time. To print. |