Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on U. & E. and AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|