California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2541 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2024
Bill June 18, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2024

Amended

Bill August 7, 2024