|
10/04/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3348.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2618.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1593.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|