Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | Read first time. To print. |