Assembly | 04/15/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | (Pending re-refer to Com. on L. E.) | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4746.) | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | Read first time. To print. |