Assembly
|
07/15/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4627.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|