California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2581 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill August 14, 2024
Bill April 10, 2024