|
07/15/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 109, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4998.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|