Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2024 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | Read first time. To print. |