California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2606 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 21, 2024
Bill June 27, 2024
Bill June 24, 2024