California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2624 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill July 1, 2024
Bill June 13, 2024
Bill April 24, 2024