|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 838, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|