Assembly | 04/23/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | Read first time. To print. |