Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5605.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|