|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 517, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3038.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2387.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1075.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|