California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2640 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Amended

Bill June 20, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 15, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024