Assembly | 04/25/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | Read first time. To print. |