California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB267 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2023

Amended

Bill July 5, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023