Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2024 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | Read first time. To print. |