|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 732, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5597.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|