|
09/30/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1009, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 4.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 7.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 4. Page 5317.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.M. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|