Assembly | 04/23/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9). | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | Read first time. To print. |