Assembly
|
09/29/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5498.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|