California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2695 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill May 16, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024