California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2697 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 23, 2024
Bill June 27, 2024
Bill April 9, 2024
Bill March 19, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024