California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2700 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Amended

Bill April 16, 2024
Bill April 11, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024