|
09/14/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 242, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 4.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|