Assembly | 07/15/2024 | Vetoed by Governor. | ||
07/01/2024 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/20/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4627.). | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2024 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5160.) | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | Referred to Com. on C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | Read first time. To print. |