California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2711 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill August 21, 2024
Bill July 3, 2024
Bill April 29, 2024
Bill April 15, 2024