Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | Read first time. To print. |