Assembly
|
09/27/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 2.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 5501.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|