California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2725 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill April 15, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024