California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB273 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill July 10, 2023
Bill June 23, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023