California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2739 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2024

Amended

Bill August 23, 2024
Bill August 19, 2024
Bill August 15, 2024