|
09/14/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 244, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5160.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|