|
09/19/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 279, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 14.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 13. Page 5296.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5181.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|