California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2749 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill April 11, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024