|
09/24/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 535, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2024
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|