Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 11. Page 5555.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|